W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn. v. Wind Point Advisors, LLC
Petitioner: W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Respondent: Wind Point Advisors, LLC doing business as Wind Point Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020mc00302
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #7 . (nmf)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (Bushnaq, Darek)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena or, in the Alternative, Motion for a Protective filed by Vertellus Holdings LLC, Vertellus Integrated Pyridines LLC, Vertellus LLC, Vertellus Specialty Chemicals (Nantong) Co., Ltd., Vertellus Shanghai Trading Co., Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stover, Chad)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William S. Weltman filed by Wind Point Advisors, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/20/2020. (fms)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William S. Weltman - filed by Wind Point Advisors, LLC. (Chapple, Benjamin)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent to Respond to Petitioner's Rule 45 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to November 3, 2020 filed by Wind Point Advisors, LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re #1 MOTION to Compel. (Answering Brief due 11/3/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/5/2020. (fms)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent to Respond to Petitioner's Rule 45 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to November 3, 2020 - filed by Wind Point Advisors, LLC. (Chapple, Benjamin)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent to Respond to the Motion to Compel to October 6, 2020 filed by Wind Point Advisors, LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re #1 MOTION to Compel. (Answering Brief due 10/6/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/17/2020. (nmf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent to Respond to the Motion to Compel to October 6, 2020 - filed by Wind Point Advisors, LLC. (Chapple, Benjamin)
September 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 8, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce - filed by W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (Filing fee $ 47, receipt number ADEDC-3185206.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn. v. Wind Point Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Represented By: Darek S. Bushnaq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wind Point Advisors, LLC doing business as Wind Point Partners, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?