Truck Accessories Group, LLC v. Kenneth Ohriner
Petitioner: Truck Accessories Group, LLC doing business as LEER
Respondent: Kenneth Ohriner
Case Number: 1:2020mc00359
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 CASE CLOSED (dlw)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER - Having reviewed the parties' submissions (D.I. 1, 7) and the Minute Entry from the Central District of California (D.I. 9), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Leer's motion to compel non-party Kenneth Ohriner to comply with the subpoena is DENIED. Leer has not shown that Mr. Ohriner's testimony is relevant or that it is the only practical means to obtain any relevant discovery. The information Leer seeks should first be sought from other more convenient and less burdensome sources, including through inventor testimony and document production. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/13/2020. (dlw)
October 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 27, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (amf)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/30/2020. (amf)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 Record of case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number in Other District: 2:20-mc-00170. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: re: Notice #6 ., ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick transferring case to U.S.D.C. Delaware. Leer's motion for a Rule 45(f) transfer is granted, and the remainder of the Motion is transferred to the U.S.D.C. for the District of Delaware. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sp) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Regina S.E. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Truck Accessories Group, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28646401) filed by Defendant Truck Accessories Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rahmanpour, Roya) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant Truck Accessories Group, LLC d/b/a Leer's Motion to Compel Compliance with Deposition Subpoena, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) filed by Defendant Truck Accessories Group, LLC. (Rahmanpour, Roya) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion to Compel Compliance with Deposition Subpoena, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) filed by Defendant Truck Accessories Group, LLC. Hearing Set for October 30, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. (Rahmanpour, Roya) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney D. Randall Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Regina S. E. Murphy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Truck Accessories Group, LLC d/b/a Leer, identifying J.B. Poindexter & Co., Inc. (Parent Company of Defendant). (Rahmanpour, Roya) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-28365347 - Fee: $47, filed by Defendant Truck Accessories Group, LLC d/b/a Leer. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Regina Murphy, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Declaration of Non-Party Kenneth H. Ohriner, #19 Proposed Order) (Attorney Roya Rahmanpour added to party Truck Accessories Group, LLC d/b/a Leer(pty:dft))(Rahmanpour, Roya) [Transferred from California Central on 10/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truck Accessories Group, LLC v. Kenneth Ohriner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Ohriner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Truck Accessories Group, LLC doing business as LEER
Represented By: Regina S.E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?