Foote v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Foote
Defendant: Steven J. Gomo, Sanjay Mehrotra, Lawrence N. Mondry, Richard M. Beyer, Patrick J. Byrne, Maryann Wright, Lynn A. Dugle, Mary Pat McCarthy, Robert E. Switz, Mercedes Johnson and Robert L. Bailey
Nominal Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00169
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 30, 2021 filed by Micron Technology, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Micron Technology, Inc. answer due 4/30/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/24/2021. (fms)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 30, 2021 - filed by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (i) for Micron Technology, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and (ii) for the remaining Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to (i) 3/24/2021 and (ii) 4/30/2021 filed by Robert Foote. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Robert L. Bailey answer due 4/30/2021; Richard M. Beyer answer due 4/30/2021; Patrick J. Byrne answer due 4/30/2021; Lynn A. Dugle answer due 4/30/2021; Steven J. Gomo answer due 4/30/2021; Mercedes Johnson answer due 4/30/2021; Mary Pat McCarthy answer due 4/30/2021; Sanjay Mehrotra answer due 4/30/2021; Micron Technology, Inc. answer due 3/24/2021; Lawrence N. Mondry answer due 4/30/2021; Robert E. Switz answer due 4/30/2021; Maryann Wright answer due 4/30/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/10/2021. (fms)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (i) for Micron Technology, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and (ii) for the remaining Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to (i) 3/24/2021 and (ii) 4/30/2021 - filed by Robert Foote. (Farnan, Brian)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Nominal Defendant Micron Technology, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 10, 2021 filed by Micron Technology, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Micron Technology, Inc. answer due 3/10/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/3/2021. (fms)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Nominal Defendant Micron Technology, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 10, 2021 - filed by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Foote. Micron Technology, Inc. served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Farnan, Michael)
February 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 9, 2021 No Summons Issued. (sam)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 Verified Shareholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Robert L. Bailey, Richard M. Beyer, Patrick J. Byrne, Lynn A. Dugle, Steven J. Gomo, Mercedes Johnson, Mary Pat McCarthy, Sanjay Mehrotra, Micron Technology, Inc., Lawrence N. Mondry, Robert E. Switz, Maryann Wright - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3514263.) - filed by Robert Foote. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foote v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Gomo
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjay Mehrotra
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence N. Mondry
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Beyer
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Byrne
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryann Wright
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn A. Dugle
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Pat McCarthy
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Switz
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Bailey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Foote
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?