Brown v. May et al
Petitioner: Judeau S. Brown, Jr.
Respondent: Robert May and Kathleen Jennings
Case Number: 1:2021cv00200
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to The Honorable Judge Colm F. Connolly from Judeau S. Brown, Jr regarding Correctional Officers not wearing masks and DI #5 Motion for Bail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(apk)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION Supplement D.I. #5 MOTION for Bail with additional exhibit - filed by Judeau S. Brown, Jr. (amf)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Bail - filed by Judeau S. Brown, Jr. (myr)
February 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 APPENDIX and Exhibits in Support of #3 MEMORANDUM - filed by Judeau S. Brown, Jr. (amf)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Judeau S. Brown, Jr. (amf)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Judeau S. Brown, Jr. (*no fee paid)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Judeau S. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?