Weirton Area Water Board et al v. Corteva, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Weirton Area Water Board and City of Weirton
Defendant: Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, LLC, Archroma U.S., Inc. and AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00343
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-49) in MDL No. 2873 In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. (ntl)
April 12, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina. (ntl)
April 12, 2021 Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:21-cv-01064, filed 04/12/2021. (kmd)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Solvay USA LLC on March 16, 2021, filed by City of Weirton, Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dynax Corporation on March 22, 2021, filed by City of Weirton, Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on DuPont de Nemours Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corteva Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Archroma US, Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on AGS Chemicals Americas Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.)
March 10, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Archroma U.S., Inc., City of Weirton, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3564573.) - filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
March 5, 2021 No Summons Issued. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weirton Area Water Board et al v. Corteva, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weirton Area Water Board
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Weirton
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?