McCreary v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Keyona McCreary
Defendant: Henrietta Johnson Medical Center and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00561
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUR-REPLY to DI #10 re DI #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Keyona McCreary. (sam)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by United States of America. (Anis, Shamoor)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 [SEALED] EXHIBIT A-J re D.I. #8 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss by Keyona McCreary. (myr)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss re D.I. #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Keyona McCreary. (myr)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION to Substitute Party: United States of America to replace Henrietta Johnson Medical Center. Party Henrietta Johnson Medical Center terminated. Attorney Shamoor Anis terminated as to this Defendant. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/28/2021. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 4/28/2021*** (dlw)
April 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Henrietta Johnson Medical Center, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Anis, Shamoor)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Henrietta Johnson Medical Center, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anis, Shamoor)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Party: United States of America to replace Henrietta Johnson Medical Center - filed by Henrietta Johnson Medical Center, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anis, Shamoor)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 [SEALED] Exhibit A (partial part - pages 11-53) for D.I. #1 Notice of Removal, by Henrietta Johnson Medical Center. (mal)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N21C-01-030 DCS (Filing fee waived)- filed by Henrietta Johnson Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C (Partial), #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCreary v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyona McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrietta Johnson Medical Center
Represented By: Shamoor Anis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Shamoor Anis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?