Whaley v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kevin Eric Whaley
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00565
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Benderson, Heather)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/21/2021. (nmg)
May 3, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David F. Chermol for Kevin Eric Whaley added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 04/30/2021. (sam)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. Chermol, Esq. filed by Kevin Eric Whaley. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/30/21. (ntl)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. Chermol, Esq. - filed by Kevin Eric Whaley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Hampton, Stephen)
April 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew M. Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (IFP Provided, No Fee Paid)- filed by Kevin Eric Whaley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Kevin Eric Whaley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(myr)
April 22, 2021 No Summons Issued. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whaley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Eric Whaley
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?