McCary et al v. John Doe Police Officer et al
Plaintiff: Venus McCary, Matthew McCary, Samantha McCary, Cameron C. McCary and S. M.
Defendant: New Castle Police Department and John Doe Police Officer
Case Number: 1:2021cv00667
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Partial Filing Fee Received from Cameron C. McCary: $ 23, receipt number DEX035844 (copy of receipt/report to business office). (kmd)
June 22, 2021 Address updated per: #18 Notice of Change of Address. (nmg)
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Cameron C. McCary (apk)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiffs Venus McCary and Matthew McCary shall file a signed copy of the Complaint on or before July 14, 2021. Venus McCary and Matthew McCary will be dismissed as Plaintiffs should they fail to timely file a complaint signed by each of them. S.M.s motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (D.I. #14 ) is DISMISSED as moot. On or before July 14, 2021, Cameron C. McCrary shall seek counsel/guardian ad litem to represent the interests of S.M. The failure to do so will results in S.M.s dismissal from the case. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/14/2021. (nms)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2021. (nms)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2021. (nms)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by S.M. (apk) Modified on 6/11/2021 (apk). (Main Document 14 replaced on 6/11/2021) (apk).
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Matthew McCary. (apk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Venus McCary. (apk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 Duplicate COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against John Doe Police Officer, New Castle Police Department - filed by S.M., Cameron C. McCary, Matthew McCary, Venus McCary.(apk) Modified on 6/11/2021 (apk).
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 Letter to Cameron McCary, from the Clerk of Court, responding to request for status (D.I. #9 ). (mal) Modified on 6/9/2021 (nms).
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 Letter to the Clerk of Court, from Cameron C. McCary, regarding a change of address and question regarding Authorization form. (mal) Modified on 6/9/2021 (nms).
June 9, 2021 Address updated per: #9 Notice of Change of Address (mal)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 Authorization by Cameron C. McCary requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (mal)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to Cameron McCary, from the Clerk of Court, providing status of case. (nmg)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 Letter to the Office of the Clerk, from Cameron McCary, regarding the status of his case. (nmg)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $23.00 shall be required. Plaintiff McCary shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. If Venus McCary, Matthew McCary, and S.M. intend to proceed in this matter, within thirty days from the date this Order is sent each shall provide the Court with their current address, each shall submit a long form application to proceed in forma pauperis, and each shall sign the Complaint. The failure to comply with this Order will result in their dismissal as a plaintiff (Copy to pltf.)(*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/11/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Authorization form) (nms) Modified on 6/11/2021 (cna, ).
May 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 Cover Letter to Clerk of Court from Cameron C. McCary, dated 5/3/2021 - re D.I. #3 Complaint. - filed by Cameron C. McCary (myr)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against John Doe Police Officer, New Castle Police Department (IFP Provided, No Fee Paid) - filed by S.M., Cameron C. McCary, Matthew McCary, Venus McCary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(myr) Modified on 6/11/2021 (cna, ).
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by Cameron C. McCary (myr)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Cameron C. McCary. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCary et al v. John Doe Police Officer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venus McCary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew McCary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha McCary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron C. McCary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?