Williams et al v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Williams and Shawn Williams
Defendant: Benjamin Stein, Howard E. Janzen, Gina Nomellini, Julius Erving, H. Brian Thompson, Chris McKee, Rhodric C. Hackman, Michael Sicoli, Elizabeth Satin, Nick Adamo, Richard D. Calder, Jr., S. Joseph Bruno and Theodore B. Smith, III
Nominal Defendant: GTT Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00690
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED re (5 in 1:21-cv-00690-MN, 7 in 1:21-cv-00211-MN, 8 in 1:21-cv-00643-MN) MOTION to Consolidate Cases // Joint Stipulation and Order Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Co-Lead Counsel filed by Shawn Williams, Dawn Williams. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/8/2021. (dlw)
June 8, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibits A & B have been added to D.I. 5. (dlw)
June 8, 2021 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:21-cv-00211-MN. (dlw)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases // Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Co-Lead Counsel - filed by Dawn Williams, Shawn Williams. (Keener, Carmella) Modified on 6/7/2021 (dlw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2021: # 3 Exhibit A & B) (dlw).
May 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/13/2021. (amf)
May 13, 2021 No Summons Issued. (amf)
May 13, 2021 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (amf)
May 13, 2021 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (CFC). (amf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Gina Nomellini, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, Benjamin Stein, and H. Brian Thompson - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3614059.) - filed by Dawn Williams and Shawn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Verifications, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Dawn Williams and Shawn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard E. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Nomellini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Erving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Brian Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodric C. Hackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sicoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Satin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Adamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Calder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Joseph Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore B. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: GTT Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Williams
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Williams
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?