Definition Services Inc. v. GVA Capital Ltd.
Plaintiff: Definition Services Inc.
Defendant: GVA Capital Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00741
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Elliot R. Peters, David J. Silbert, and Nicholas D. Marais for GVA Capital Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Oral Argument by GVA Capital Ltd. re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Gold, Adam)
July 2, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Definition Services Inc.. (Czeschin, Brock)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for Plaintiff to file its Reply in Support of its Motion to Remand (D.I. 4) to July 2, 2021 filed by Definition Services Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/29/21. (ntl)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for Plaintiff to file its Reply in Support of its Motion to Remand (D.I. 4) to July 2, 2021 - filed by Definition Services Inc.. (Czeschin, Brock)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elliot R. Peters, David J. Silbert and Nicholas D. Marais filed by GVA Capital Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/22/21. (ntl)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant GVA Capital Ltd.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Definition Services Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production, and (ii) Defendant GVA Capital Ltd.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Definition Services Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories filed by GVA Capital Ltd..(Gold, Adam)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GVA Capital Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aronstam, Bradley)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elliot R. Peters, David J. Silbert and Nicholas D. Marais - filed by GVA Capital Ltd.. (Gold, Adam)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by GVA Capital Ltd.. (Gold, Adam)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by GVA Capital Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Gold, Adam)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sprain Capital Ltd. (a Cayman entity) for Definition Services Inc. filed by Definition Services Inc.. (Czeschin, Brock)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Definition Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Czeschin, Brock)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time filed by GVA Capital Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/2/21. (ntl)
June 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by GVA Capital Ltd.. (Gold, Adam)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Chancery Court of DE, Case Number 2021-0357-KSJM (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3622690)- filed by GVA Capital Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Definition Services Inc. v. GVA Capital Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Definition Services Inc.
Represented By: Brock Elliot Czeschin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GVA Capital Ltd.
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Adam Dylan Gold
Represented By: David J. Silbert
Represented By: Elliot R. Peters
Represented By: Nicholas D. Marais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?