Demby v. Saul
Plaintiff: Angie Alicia Demby
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00809
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather)
June 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward A. Wicklund for Angie Alicia Demby added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER - Within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this order, an entry of appearance shall be filed identifying the Special Assistant United States Attorney who will appear to defend the Commission of Social Security. Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/9/2021. (dlw)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/9/2021. (dlw)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Wicklund filed by Angie Alicia Demby. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/9/2021. (dlw)
June 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Wicklund - filed by Angie Alicia Demby. (Linarducci, Gary)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Angie Alicia Demby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Angie Alicia Demby. (amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demby v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Alicia Demby
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?