McCary v. Dr. August et al
Plaintiff: Cameron C. McCary
Defendant: Dr. August, Jane Doe, Records Mike, Nakiya Lesene, Centurion / MHM, Lt. R. Hosten-Jones and Medical Grievance Panel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00911
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Partial Filing Fee Received from Cameron C. McCary: $ 29.65, receipt number DEX036006 (copy of receipt/report to business office). (kmd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 Letter to Cameron McCary, from the Clerk of Court, responding to the request for information about the grievances forms sent to the Court. (mal) Modified on 7/20/2021 (nms).
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 Letter to the Clerk of Court, dated 07/15/21, from Cameron McCary, requesting information about Grievances forms that he sent to the Court. (mal)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 Authorization by Cameron C. McCary requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (mal)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $29.65 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf.)(Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/6/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Authorization Form) (nms)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to Cameron C. McCary, from the Clerk of Court, regarding request for copy work and status. (apk) Modified on 7/2/2021 (nms).
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 Trust Fund Account Statement by Cameron C. McCary (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (apk)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 Letter to Cameron C. McCary, from the Clerk of Court, responding to the request for copy work. (smg) Modified on 6/30/2021 (nms).
June 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 Letter to the Clerk of Court, dated 6/24/2021, from Cameron C. McCary, attaching exhibits in support of the Complaint. (smg) Modified on 6/30/2021 (nms).
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against Defendants Dr August, Records Mike, Centurion/MHM, Nakiya Lesene, Jane Doe, Lt. R. Hosten-Jones, and Medical Grievance Panel - filed by Cameron C. McCary.(srs)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Cameron C. McCary. (srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCary v. Dr. August et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. August
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Records Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nakiya Lesene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion / MHM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. R. Hosten-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Grievance Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron C. McCary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?