Eli Lilly and Company v. Radius Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Defendant: Radius Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01003
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,517,334 B2. (nmf)
August 10, 2021 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #7 . (nmf)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eli Lilly and Company (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (twk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,517,334 B2. (twk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/28/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 3/25/2025. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/28/2023. (twk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Radius Health, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3653247.) - filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eli Lilly and Company v. Radius Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?