AP Atlantic, Inc. v. Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company
Plaintiff: AP Atlantic, Inc. doing business as Adolfson & Peterson Construction
Defendant: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01008
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/24/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Counsel for Plaintiff shall coordinate the call and email the dial-in information to chambers at cfc_civil@ded.uscourts.gov. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/30/2021. (nmf)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Brown filed by AP Atlantic, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/30/2021. (nmf)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Brown - filed by AP Atlantic, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company.(Tome, Brian)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Tome on behalf of Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company (Tome, Brian)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by AP Atlantic, Inc.. Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
July 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3654199.) - filed by AP Atlantic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AP Atlantic, Inc. v. Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AP Atlantic, Inc. doing business as Adolfson & Peterson Construction
Represented By: Alessandra Glorioso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Tome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?