Rooks et al v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Rooks and Geraldine Rooks
Defendant: John Doe and DEPARTMENT OF SAFETY AND HOMELAND SECURITY- DIVISION OF STATE POLICE
Case Number: 1:2021cv01013
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 Stipulation and Order Regarding Service of the Complaint and Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: DEPARTMENT OF SAFETY AND HOMELAND SECURITY- DIVISION OF STATE POLICE answer due 10/18/2021; John Doe answer due 10/18/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/20/2021. (dlw)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Accept Service & to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Geraldine Rooks, Raymond Rooks. (Gallagher, Patrick)
July 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against DEPARTMENT OF SAFETY AND HOMELAND SECURITY- DIVISION OF STATE POLICE, and John Doe - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3654785.) - filed by Raymond Rooks, Geraldine Rooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs)
July 12, 2021 No Summons Issued. (srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rooks et al v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Rooks
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Alexis Stombaugh
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Rooks
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Alexis Stombaugh
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF SAFETY AND HOMELAND SECURITY- DIVISION OF STATE POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?