Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated v. Lupin Limited et al
Counter Defendant: Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Counter Claimant: Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01019
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated.(Fahnestock, Derek)
September 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Vertex Pharmaceutical Incorporated's Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 4(a) of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated.(Fahnestock, Derek)
August 20, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Lupin Limited, Other Affiliate Lupin, Inc., Other Affiliate Nanomi B.V. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murphy, Francis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Lupin Limited. (Murphy, Francis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim against All Plaintiffs, by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Murphy, Francis) Modified on 8/21/2021 (nms).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith D. Parr; Nina Vachhani; James Peterka; and Christopher J. Cassella, filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/19/2021. (nms)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith D. Parr; Nina Vachhani; James Peterka; and Christopher J. Cassella - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murphy, Francis)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dimitrios T. Drivas, Alison Hanstead, C. Sebastian Zonte, and Mila Owen, filed by Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2021. (nms)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Limited answer due 8/20/2021; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 8/20/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2021. (nms)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to August 20, 2021 - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murphy, Francis)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dimitrios T. Drivas, Alison Hanstead, C. Sebastian Zonte, and Mila Owen - filed by Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Fahnestock, Derek)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis J. Murphy, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy, Francis)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Parshall on behalf of All Defendants (Parshall, Jonathan)
July 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Related Papers served on Lupin Limited on July 15, 2021, filed by Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Fahnestock, Derek)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (apk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,646,481 B2. (apk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 06/2/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 08/13/2029.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 12/2/2023. (apk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3656608.) - filed by Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated v. Lupin Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lupin Limited
Represented By: Francis J. Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Francis J. Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?