Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Lupin Inc.
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01105
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jane M. Love for Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS(srs)
September 17, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Kyanna Sabanoglu, Anne Y. Brody, Ronald A. Lee, Sung Bin Lee for Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS(srs)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (14 in 1:21-cv-01107-LPS, 11 in 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 12 in 1:21-cv-01106-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/21. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS (ntl)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee - filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee)(Silver, Daniel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Limited, Corporate Parent Nanomi B.V. for Lupin Inc. filed by Lupin Inc.. (Lennon, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Lupin Inc..(Lennon, James)
August 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS (rjb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Lupin Inc. served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Joyce, Alexandra)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lupin Inc. on 7/30/2021. (mal)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (mal)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,575,146. (mal)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than 06/14/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 12/2/2030 (8,575,146). Thirty Month Stay Deadline: No Earlier than 12/14/2023 (mal)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Lupin Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3668317.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Lupin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Anne Y. Brody
Represented By: Jane M. Love
Represented By: Kyanna Sabanoglu
Represented By: Ronald A. Lee
Represented By: Sung Bin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?