Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al v. Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01106
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Constance S. Huttner and Beth C. Finkelstein for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
September 17, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Kyanna Sabanoglu, Anne Y. Brody, Ronald A. Lee, Sung Bin Lee for Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS(srs)
September 17, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jane M. Love for Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS(srs)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (14 in 1:21-cv-01107-LPS, 11 in 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 12 in 1:21-cv-01106-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/21. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS (ntl)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Constance S. Huttner and Beth C. Finkelstein filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/21. (ntl)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee - filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee)(Silver, Daniel)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Constance S. Huttner and Beth C. Finkelstein - filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Ormerod, Eve)
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.. (Belgam, Neal)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Additional Defenses by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint from August 20, 2021 to September 3, 2021 filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/19/21. (ntl)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint from August 20, 2021 to September 3, 2021 - filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
August 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS (rjb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. on 7/30/2021; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. on 7/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(myr)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (myr)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. (myr)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,973,031. (myr)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than June 16, 2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: No earlier than July 13, 2025.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: No Earlier than 12/16/2023. (myr)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3668327.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al v. Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Anne Y. Brody
Represented By: Jane M. Love
Represented By: Kyanna Sabanoglu
Represented By: Ronald A. Lee
Represented By: Sung Bin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Anne Y. Brody
Represented By: Jane M. Love
Represented By: Kyanna Sabanoglu
Represented By: Ronald A. Lee
Represented By: Sung Bin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Beth C. Finkelstein
Represented By: Constance S. Huttner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Beth C. Finkelstein
Represented By: Constance S. Huttner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?