Boriqua-Doheny v. The Milford School District Board of Education
Plaintiff: Carmen Boriqua-Doheny
Defendant: Ross Elementary School, Milford School District and The Milford School District Board of Education
Case Number: 1:2021cv01128
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Carmen Boriqua-Doheny: For The Milford School District Board of Education waiver sent on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Poliquin, Ronald)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Milford School District Board of Education- filed by Carmen Boriqua-Doheny, The Milford School District Board of Education.(Poliquin, Ronald)
August 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Milford School District, Ross Elementary School - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3671369.) - filed by Carmen Boriqua-Doheny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)
August 3, 2021 No Summons Issued. (mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boriqua-Doheny v. The Milford School District Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Boriqua-Doheny
Represented By: Ronald George Poliquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Elementary School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milford School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Milford School District Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?