Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01132
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC. (Silver, Daniel)
August 20, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Emma Notis-McConarty and Filko Prugo for Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC: For Cadila Healthcare Ltd. waiver sent on 8/10/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC: For Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 8/10/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Filko Prugo and Emma Notis-McConarty filed by Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/19/2021. (fms)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Filko Prugo and Emma Notis-McConarty - filed by Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Certifications)(Silver, Daniel)
August 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 08/4/2021. (apk)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on 8/4/2021. (srs)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cadila Healthcare Ltd. on 8/4/2021. (srs)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parents Sawai America, LLC., Sawai America Holdings, Inc., and Sumitomo Corporation of Americas for Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC filed by Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC. (srs)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed against Cadila Healthcare Ltd. and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BDEDC-3671952.) - filed by Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to file Complaint and Exhibit under Seal - filed by Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(srs).
August 4, 2021 Remark: Case Submitted for Routine Judicial Assignment. (apk)
August 4, 2021 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (CFC). (srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Emma Notis-McConarty
Represented By: Filko Prugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?