Overcash v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Allison M. Overcash
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv01140
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses served on U.S. Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney on August 17, 2021, filed by Allison M. Overcash. (Linarducci, Gary)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Benderson, Heather)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout - filed by Allison M. Overcash. (Linarducci, Gary)
August 11, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Allison M. Overcash added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
August 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout, filed by Allison M. Overcash. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/11/2021. (nms)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Kilolo Kijakazi on 8/5/2021. (apk)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Kilolo Kijakazi - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3673019.) - filed by Allison M. Overcash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overcash v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison M. Overcash
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?