Sommer v. Southwestern Energy Company et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Sommer
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company, Catherine A. Kehr, John D. Gass, Greg D. Kerley, Jon A. Marshall, Patrick M. Prevost, Anne Taylor, Denis J. Walsh III, S.P. "Chip&quot Johnson IV and William J. Way
Case Number: 1:2021cv01153
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nathaniel Sommer as to Voluntary Dismissal (Bennett, Blake)
September 13, 2021 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Southwestern Energy Company. (Micheletti, Edward)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Bennett Micheletti on behalf of All Defendants (Micheletti, Edward)
August 16, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For William J. Way waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For Denis J. Walsh III waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For Anne Taylor waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For Patrick M. Prevost waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For Jon A. Marshall waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For Catherine A. Kehr waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For Greg D. Kerley waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For S.P. "Chip" Johnson IV waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For John D. Gass waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nathaniel Sommer: For Southwestern Energy Company waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
August 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against John D. Gass, S.P. "Chip" Johnson IV, Catherine A. Kehr, Greg D. Kerley, Jon A. Marshall, Patrick M. Prevost, Southwestern Energy Company, Anne Taylor, Denis J. Walsh III, William J. Way - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3675148.) - filed by Nathaniel Sommer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
August 9, 2021 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sommer v. Southwestern Energy Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Sommer
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Kehr
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Gass
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg D. Kerley
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon A. Marshall
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Prevost
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Taylor
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis J. Walsh III
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.P. "Chip&quot Johnson IV
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Way
Represented By: Edward Bennett Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?