Rockwell Automation, Inc. v. EU Automation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Defendant: EU Automation, Inc. and EU Automation America Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01162
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Jeremy A. Cohen,Jeremy Schachter,Edward F. Maluf, and Owen Wolfe for EU Automation America Ltd. and EU Automation, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward F. Maluf, Jeremy A. Cohen, Jeremy Schachter, and Owen R. Wolfe - filed by EU Automation America Ltd., EU Automation, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward F. Maluf, Jeremy A. Cohen, Jeremy Schachter, and Owen R. Wolfe filed by EU Automation, Inc., EU Automation America Ltd. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/16/2021. (dlw)
September 15, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 10/22/2021 - filed by EU Automation America Ltd., EU Automation, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Farnan on behalf of EU Automation America Ltd., EU Automation, Inc. (Farnan, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of EU Automation America Ltd., EU Automation, Inc. (Farnan, Brian)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 10/22/2021 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: EU Automation America Ltd. answer due 10/22/2021; EU Automation, Inc. answer due 10/22/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/15/2021. (dlw)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. EU Automation, Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul Tanck and Neal J. McLaughlin of Alston & Bird LLP - filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 31, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Neal J. McLaughlin and Paul J. Tanck for Rockwell Automation, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul Tanck and Neal J. McLaughlin of Alston & Bird LLP filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/31/2021. (dlw)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 Postal Receipt(s) for the mailing of process to EU Automation America Ltd. (twk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 PRAECIPE filed by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. requesting Clerk to issue (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Neal J. Mclaughlin re #5 Letter by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 8/27/2021 (dlw).
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 Letter to Mr. John A. Cerino, Clerk of Court from Dominick T. Gattuso, Esquire regarding Service of Process re: EU Automation America Ltd.,. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (mal)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) see attached. (Attachments: #1 Additional Patent Report)(mal)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against EU Automation America Ltd., EU Automation, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3676438.) - filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)
August 11, 2021 No Summons Issued. (mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwell Automation, Inc. v. EU Automation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Neal J. McLaughlin
Represented By: Paul J. Tanck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EU Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Edward F. Maluf
Represented By: Jeremy A. Cohen
Represented By: Jeremy Schachter
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Owen Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EU Automation America Ltd.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Cohen
Represented By: Jeremy Schachter
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Edward F. Maluf
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Owen Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?