Mergenthaler v. Enzolytics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Peter Mergenthaler
Defendant: Enzolytics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01163
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Enzolytics, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/18/2021. (Garibian, Antranig)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Enzolytics, Inc.. (Attachments: #2 Certificate of Service)(Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 10/4/2021 (nms).
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Enzolytics, Inc.. (Garibian, Antranig)
October 4, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The brief filed as an attachment to the motion at D.I. #7 has been removed. Motions and briefs are to be filed independent of each other. Counsel shall refile the brief accordingly. (nms)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's time to reply or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to October 4, 2021 - filed by Enzolytics, Inc.. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Enzolytics, Inc. answer due 10/4/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2021. (nms)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark J. Kallenbach, filed by Peter Mergenthaler. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/18/2021. (nms)
August 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Mergenthaler. Enzolytics, Inc. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Edmonson, Jamie)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark J. Kallenbach - filed by Peter Mergenthaler. (Edmonson, Jamie)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Enzolytics, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3676490.) - filed by Peter Mergenthaler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
August 11, 2021 No Summons Issued. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mergenthaler v. Enzolytics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mergenthaler
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Edmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enzolytics, Inc.
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?