Pfizer Inc. et al v. Natco Pharma, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC and PF PRISM IMB B.V.
Defendant: Natco Pharma, Inc. and Natco Pharma, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01179
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David I. Berl, Christopher J. Mandernach, Michael Xun Liu, Seth R. Bowers, Andrew Hoffman and Kevin Hoagland-Hanson - filed by PF Prism IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (18 in 1:21-cv-01179-CFC, 25 in 1:21-cv-00929-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David I. Berl, Christopher J. Mandernach, Michael Xun Liu, Seth R. Bowers, Andrew Hoffman and Kevin Hoagland-Hanson filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., PF Prism IMB B.V. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/14/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00929-CFC, 1:21-cv-01179-CFC (kmd)
October 12, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Karen L. Beckman, B. Jefferson Boggs, Jr, Andrew O. Larsen, and Christopher J. Sorenson for Natco Pharma, Inc. and Natco Pharma, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Jefferson Boggs, Christopher J. Sorenson, Karen L. Beckman and Andrew O. Larsen - filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Natco Pharma, Inc. and Natco Pharma, Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and (2) Defendants Natco Pharma, Inc. and Natco Pharma, Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to the Delaware Default Standard Paragraph 3 filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
October 6, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Enter Protective Order by PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dellinger, Megan)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Jefferson Boggs, Christopher J. Sorenson, Karen L. Beckman and Andrew O. Larsen filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/6/2021. (kmd)
October 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and (2) Plaintiffs' Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Dellinger, Megan)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2022. Fact Discovery completed by 2/4/2022. Expert Discovery due by 8/5/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/9/2022. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/30/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Bench Trial is set for 12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/28/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02912-CFC, 1:21-cv-01179-CFC(nmf)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Should any party (or all parties) desire to discuss mediation and its timing, the party(ies) shall contact Judge Thynge and her Law Clerk, Daniel Taylor (#daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov), to request that a teleconference be scheduled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/28/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01179-CFC, 1:19-md-02912-CFC(Taylor, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01179-CFC, 1:19-md-02912-CFC(Taylor, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Dellinger, Megan)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Natco Pharma Inc. for Natco Pharma, Ltd. filed by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Megan E. Dellinger regarding cases in MDL No. 19-2912. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc., PF PRISM IMB B.V.: For Natco Pharma, Ltd. waiver sent on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc., PF PRISM IMB B.V.: For Natco Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Natco Pharma, Inc. on 8/17/2021; Natco Pharma, Ltd. on 8/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(myr)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for PF PRISM IMB B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Pfizer Inc. has no parent corporation filed by PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (myr)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE47,739 E ;10,723,730 B2. (myr)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than July 14, 2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/14/2024. (myr)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Natco Pharma, Inc., Natco Pharma, Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3679610.) - filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc., PF PRISM IMB B.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. et al v. Natco Pharma, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF PRISM IMB B.V.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natco Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Andrew O. Larsen
Represented By: B. Jefferson Boggs, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher J. Sorenson
Represented By: Karen L. Beckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natco Pharma, Ltd.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Andrew O. Larsen
Represented By: B. Jefferson Boggs, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher J. Sorenson
Represented By: Karen L. Beckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?