Bowers v. Delaware Board of Parole Dept.
Plaintiff: Corey R. Bowers
Defendant: Delaware Board of Parole Dept Office Lead Personnel/Staff Leader, Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Receptionist/ Case Filing Manager/ Office Clerk, Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Manager and Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Supervisor
Case Number: 1:2021cv01275
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER determining initial partial filing fee of $193.06 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/04/2021. (srs)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Trust Fund Account Statement by Corey R. Bowers (myr)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/20/2021.) Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 09/20/2021. (smg)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se pursuant to 42:1983 against Delaware Board of Parole Dept Office Lead Personnel/Staff Leader, Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Receptionist/ Case Filing Manager/ Office Clerk , Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Manager, and Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Supervisor - filed by Corey R. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Partial Trust Fund Account Statement by Corey R. Bowers. (srs)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Corey R. Bowers. (srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Delaware Board of Parole Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Board of Parole Dept Office Lead Personnel/Staff Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Receptionist/ Case Filing Manager/ Office Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Board of Parole Dept. Office Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?