Cosmetic Warriors Limited v. LUS Brands Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cosmetic Warriors Limited
Defendant: LUS Brands Inc. and Lus Distribution Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01335
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/29/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2022. Fact Discovery completed by 7/1/2022. Opening Expert Reports due by 8/1/2022. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 8/31/2022. Reply Expert Reports due by 9/30/2022. Expert Discovery due by 10/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2022. A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/10/2023 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 4/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/17/2021. (dlw)
November 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (Taylor, Daniel)
November 15, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ian G. McFarland for Cosmetic Warriors Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER // Scheduling Order by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 11/15/2021 (dlw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Mosley Delcollo on behalf of LUS Brands Inc., Lus Distribution Inc. (Delcollo, Renee)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Whetzel on behalf of LUS Brands Inc., Lus Distribution Inc. (Whetzel, Robert)
October 14, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Heather Kliebenstein for Cosmetic Warriors Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
October 14, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Jason M. Joyal and David M. Kelly for LUS Brands Inc. and Lus Distribution Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/13/2021. (dlw)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent LUS Holdings Inc. for Lus Distribution Inc. filed by Lus Distribution Inc.. (Mowery, Katharine)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by LUS Brands Inc.. (Mowery, Katharine)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by LUS Brands Inc., Lus Distribution Inc..(Mowery, Katharine)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heather Kliebenstein and Ian McFarland - filed by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. (Farnan, Brian)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heather Kliebenstein and Ian McFarland filed by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/13/2021. (dlw)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Kelly and Jason M. Joyal filed by Lus Distribution Inc., LUS Brands Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/13/2021. (dlw)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Kelly and Jason M. Joyal - filed by LUS Brands Inc., Lus Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David Kelly, #2 Certification of Jason M. Joyal)(Mowery, Katharine)
September 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to LUS Brands Inc. on 9/22/2021; Lus Distribution Inc. on 9/22/2021. (twk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. (twk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 2,282,428; 2,853,483; 3,001,303; 3,008,685; 3,102,767; 3,987,808; 4,118,438; 4,532,289; 79/281,982. (twk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against LUS Brands Inc., Lus Distribution Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3704582.) - filed by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosmetic Warriors Limited v. LUS Brands Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosmetic Warriors Limited
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Heather Kliebenstein
Represented By: Ian G. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUS Brands Inc.
Represented By: Renee Mosley Delcollo
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel
Represented By: David M. Kelly
Represented By: Jason M. Joyal
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lus Distribution Inc.
Represented By: Renee Mosley Delcollo
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel
Represented By: David M. Kelly
Represented By: Jason M. Joyal
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?