Paycom Software, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Paycom Software, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and QBE Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01403
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Transfer re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma by Paycom Software, Inc.. (Wasson, Jennifer)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, QBE Insurance Corporation. Re-Set Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 12/2/2021., Reply Brief due 12/17/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/29/2021. (kmd)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXHIBIT re #14 Opening Brief in Support, Certificate of Compliance to Defendants' Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by QBE Insurance Corporation, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Katzenstein, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma Declaration of Charles W. Chotvacs in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Katzenstein, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma Declaration of Matthew W. Beato in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Katzenstein, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma filed by QBE Insurance Corporation, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/12/2021. (Katzenstein, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma - filed by QBE Insurance Corporation, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Katzenstein, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Katzenstein, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer and Affirmative Defenses by QBE Insurance Corporation.(Katzenstein, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen T. Raptis for Paycom Software, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen T. Raptis - filed by Paycom Software, Inc.. (Wasson, Jennifer)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Paycom Software, Inc.. (Wasson, Jennifer)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen T. Raptis filed by Paycom Software, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/6/2021. (kmd)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to October 28, 2021 filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, QBE Insurance Corporation. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: QBE Insurance Corporation answer due 10/28/2021; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 10/28/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/6/2021. (kmd)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to October 28, 2021 - filed by QBE Insurance Corporation, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Katzenstein, Robert)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America on September 17, 2021 filed by Paycom Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Jones, Carla)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on QBE Insurance Corporation on September 21, 2021 filed by Paycom Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Jones, Carla)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on QBE Insurance Corporation, c/o CT Corporation System, on September 20, 2021 filed by Paycom Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Jones, Carla)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent QBE Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group Limited, Corporate Parent QBE Reinsurance Corporation for QBE Insurance Corporation filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (myr)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Group Holdings Inc. for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (myr)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N21C-09-047 MMJ CCLD (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3712166)- filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paycom Software, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paycom Software, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Catherine Wasson
Represented By: Carla Michelle Jones
Represented By: Stephen T. Raptis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Robert J. Katzenstein
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Robert J. Katzenstein
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?