Protective Life Insurance Company v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01432
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Protective Life Insurance Company by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Primack, David)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 3, 2021 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/10/21. (ntl)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 3, 2021 - filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Primack, David)
October 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protective Life Insurance Company. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Ekiner, Kaan)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3716285.) - filed by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)
October 7, 2021 No Summons Issued. (twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protective Life Insurance Company v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaan Ekiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David Phillip Primack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?