Smith v. Laurel Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Hero T. Smith and Tiera T. Smith
Defendant: Laurel Police Department, Donald McGinty, Michael J. Wilson, Ricky Richardson and Derrick Calloway
Case Number: 1:2021cv01557
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting D.I. #4 Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing fee of $350.00 assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $96.89 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/3/2022.) Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/30/2021. (nmg)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Trust Fund Account Statement by Hero T. Smith (smg)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Hero T. Smith. (smg)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerk of Court, a request to proceed in forma pauperis and a certified copy of her prison trust fund account statement (memorandum or institutional equivalent, with attachments)showing all deposits, expenditures and balances during the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint, obtained from the appropriate official at each institution at which Plaintiff is confined. Failure of Plaintiff to return the requested information within 30 days from the date of this order shall result in dismissal of this action without prejudice.( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/3/2021.). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/4/2021. (apk)
November 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 (NO FEE PAID, NO IFP) against Derrick Calloway, Laurel Police Department, Donald McGinty, Ricky Richardson, Michael J. Wilson - filed by Hero T. Smith.(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Laurel Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hero T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiera T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?