Shivers Jr. v. May et al
Plaintiff: Dwight L. Shivers Jr.
Defendant: Natasha L. Hollingsworth, Lt. Heisman, Lt. Kevin S. Lorick and Warden May
Case Number: 1:2021cv01598
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: An initial partial filing fee of $30.42 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf.) (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/2/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Authorization form) (nms)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 Trust Fund Account Statement by Dwight L. Shivers Jr. (srs)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit a complete prison trust fund account statement which includes ledger sheets showing all deposits, expenditures and balances during the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf.) (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/18/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2021. (nms)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Dwight L. Shivers Jr. (twk)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf.)(*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/17/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/17/2021. (nms)
November 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shivers Jr. v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight L. Shivers Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha L. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Heisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Kevin S. Lorick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?