Shover v. May et al
Petitioner: Ryan Shover
Respondent: Robert May and Kathleen Jennings
Case Number: 1:2021cv01858
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 Letter MOTION to Stay - filed by Ryan Shover. (apk)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER notifying petitioner that AEDPA applies to petition and petitioner must file attached election form with the court. (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/9/2022.). ORDER, Petitioner's Motion to Stay (D.I. #4 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice to renew. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/7/2022. (twk)
January 5, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Ryan Shover. (mal)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Stay of Abeyance re D.I. #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Ryan Shover. (mal)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Law in support of D.I. #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ryan Shover.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/13/2022. (mal)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (No IFP filed. No Filing Fee paid)- filed by Ryan Shover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shover v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Shover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?