Pumphrey v. May et al
Petitioner: Elton Leroy Pumphrey
Respondent: Robert May and Kathleen Jennings
Case Number: 1:2022cv00024
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 MOTION for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Kathleen Jennings answer due 5/6/2022; Robert May answer due 5/6/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/23/2022. (nms)
February 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time - filed by Delaware DOJ (530), Kathleen Jennings, Robert May. (McFarlan, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/22/2022 (nms).
January 31, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan on behalf of Delaware DOJ (530), Kathleen Jennings, Robert May (McFarlan, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order: The Clerk shall serve an electronic copy of the Petition (D.I. 2), the Memorandum of Law in Support (D.I. 4), the initial AEDPA Order (D.I. 7), the AEDPA Election Form (D.I. 8), and this Order upon the Delaware Department of Justice ("DDOJ") (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 D.I. 2, #2 D.I. 4, #3 D.I. 7, #4 D.I. 8) (nms)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 Letter to Clerk of Court, from Elton Pumphrey, enclosing additional copies. (Attachments: #1 Copy of D.I. 8)(srs) Modified on 1/31/2022 (nms).
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 AEDPA Election Form filed by petitioner and requesting to rule on 2254 as currently pending. (mal)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Notifying petitioner that AEDPA applies to petition and petitioner must file attached election form with the court. (Copy to pet. with AEDPA Form) (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/18/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 AEDPA Election Form) (nms)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel - filed by Elton Leroy Pumphrey. (smg)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to the Clerk of Court, from Elton Leroy Pumphrey, dated 1/6/2022, regarding filing fee. (myr)
January 12, 2022 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number DEX036825 (smg)
January 12, 2022 Remark: Copy of D.I. #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, D.I. #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and D.I. #4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support sent to case jacket. (myr)
January 12, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Elton Leroy Pumphrey.(smg)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Elton Leroy Pumphrey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter regarding filing fee)(smg)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Elton Leroy Pumphrey. (smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pumphrey v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elton Leroy Pumphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert May
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?