Curry v. Curry III
Plaintiff: Erin Curry
Defendant: William Curry III
Case Number: 1:2022cv00449
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of No Ability to Sustain A Persona Standi in Judicio (Not a Pleading) by Erin Curry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(smg)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to the New Castle County Family Court from the U.S. District Court of Delaware remanding the above captioned case. (nmg)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, this matter is summarily REMANDED to the Family Court of the State of Delaware in and for New Castle County. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/7/2022. (nmg)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of No Ability to Sustain a Persona Standi in Judicio (Not a Pleading) filed by William Curry III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (nmg)
April 6, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from State of Delaware Family Court, Case Number 21-27317 (Filing fee $402, receipt number DEX037336)- filed by William Curry III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Filing, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/5/2022) (apk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Curry III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Curry III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?