Foundation for Eldercare v. United States of America Department of Agriculture-Delaware Division
Plaintiff: Foundation for Eldercare
Defendant: United States of America Department of Agriculture-Delaware Division
Case Number: 1:2022cv00705
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian D. Barr - filed by Foundation for Eldercare. (Whitney, Holly)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian D. Barr filed by Foundation for Eldercare. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/6/2022. (dlw)
June 1, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America Department of Agriculture-Delaware Division on 5/31/2022. (smg)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Foundation for Eldercare. (smg)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against United States of America Department of Agriculture-Delaware Division ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3884033.) - filed by Foundation for Eldercare. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foundation for Eldercare v. United States of America Department of Agriculture-Delaware Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foundation for Eldercare
Represented By: Holly M Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Agriculture-Delaware Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?