Coad et al v. Crane Co. et al
Plaintiff: Loren D. Coad and Debra Coad
Defendant: Grinnell LLC, Paramount Global Inc., Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., FMC Corporation, Grinnell Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc. and Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00727
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 Letter to Judge Sherry R. Fallon from David W. deBruin regarding Status of Service of Complaint and Defendants' Answers - re #6 Order. (deBruin, David) Modified on 7/29/2022 (lih).
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Debra Coad, Loren D. Coad: Entry of appearance of attorney David W. deBruin. Attorney Katherine Barksdale terminated. (deBruin, David)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #6 Order. Whereas, the Plaintiff was to file a response to the court's June 23, 2022 Order on or before July 7, 2022, and to date, a response has not been filed, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall respond to the aforementioned Order on or before August 2, 2022. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/29/2022. (lih)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 9/13/2022 at 3:00 p.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 9/8/2022. (3) Counsel are instructed to use Judge Fallon's form asbestos scheduling order posted at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon for all events up to and including Status Conference and Judge Noreika's form non-patent scheduling order posted at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/judge-maryellen-noreika for all events including and following Case Dispositive Motions and shall include a chart of the deadlines as an exhibit to the proposed Scheduling Order. Regardless of the number of Daubert motions and case dispositive issues raised by a moving party, the moving party shall file only one opening brief with briefing subject to the page limitations set forth in Local Rule 7.1.3(4), 20 pages for the opening and answering briefs and 10 pages for the reply. These requirements shall be included in the proposed Scheduling Order. (4) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/29/2022. (lih)
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of ITT Corporation (Costello, Kelly)
July 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Costello, Kelly)
July 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Costello, Kelly)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/23/2022. (lih)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Crane Holdings, Co. for Crane Co. filed by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Crane Co. (Skiles, Nicholas)
June 8, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 8, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global Inc. filed by Paramount Global Inc. (smg)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N22C-03-211 ASB (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3887481)- filed by Paramount Global Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coad et al v. Crane Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren D. Coad
Represented By: Katherine Barksdale
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Coad
Represented By: Katherine Barksdale
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?