Barnes et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Margaret Barnes, Eric Senkyrik, Sharon Jackon and Michael Hogan
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00823
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:22-cv-05070, filed 07/21/2022. (smg)
July 21, 2022 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. (kmd)
July 21, 2022 Case transferred to the Central District of California. (kmd)
July 7, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura E. Goolsby, Cody R. Padgett, and Tarek H. Zohdy for Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon, and Eric Senkyrik added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie Lesser filed by Eric Senkyrik, Sharon Jackon, Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cody R. Padget filed by Eric Senkyrik, Sharon Jackon, Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura E. Goolsby filed by Eric Senkyrik, Sharon Jackon, Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amey J. Park filed by Eric Senkyrik, Sharon Jackon, Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Abigail J. Gertner filed by Eric Senkyrik, Sharon Jackon, Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy filed by Eric Senkyrik, Sharon Jackon, Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/6/2022. (nmf)
July 6, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Natalie Lesser, Abigail J. Gertner, and Amey J. Park for Margaret Barnes added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Margaret Barnes, Eric Senkyrik, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon: For Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 6/30/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (Paul, Russell)
June 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy - filed by Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon, Eric Senkyrik. (Paul, Russell) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/29/2022) (srs).
June 29, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura E. Goolsby - filed by Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon, Eric Senkyrik. (Paul, Russell) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/29/2022) (srs).
June 29, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cody R. Padget - filed by Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon, Eric Senkyrik. (Paul, Russell) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/29/2022) (srs).
June 29, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 29, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #7 , #8 , and #9 replaced per counsel's request. (srs)
June 24, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie Lesser - filed by Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon, Eric Senkyrik. (Paul, Russell)
June 24, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Abigail J. Gertner - filed by Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon, Eric Senkyrik. (Paul, Russell)
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amey J. Park - filed by Margaret Barnes, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon, Eric Senkyrik. (Paul, Russell)
June 17, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company on 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(mpb)
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3898758.) - filed by Margaret Barnes, Eric Senkyrik, Michael Hogan, Sharon Jackon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Barnes
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Senkyrik
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Jackon
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hogan
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?