Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. v. Wilmington Trust N.A.
Plaintiff: Ameritas Life Insurance Corp.
Defendant: Wilmington Trust N.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00910
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2022)
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Ameritas Life Insurance Corp..(Ekiner, Kaan)
September 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Wilmington Trust N.A..(O'Connor, Megan)
September 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas by Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. (Ekiner, Kaan)
August 16, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 17, 2022 - filed by Wilmington Trust N.A.. (Goeller, Matthew)
August 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Caponi on behalf of Wilmington Trust N.A. (Caponi, Steven)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 17, 2022 filed by Wilmington Trust N.A. Reset Answer Deadlines: Wilmington Trust N.A. answer due 9/17/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/16/2022. (etg)
July 28, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameritas Life Insurance Corp.. Wilmington Trust N.A. served on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022. (Ekiner, Kaan)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 Letter to The Honorable District Judge from Kaan Ekiner regarding Notice of Related Matter. (Ekiner, Kaan)
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl)
July 13, 2022 Filing 4 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 7/13/2022. (ntl)
July 13, 2022 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wilmington Trust N.A. on 7/7/2022. (mpb)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Wilmington Trust N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3911349.) - filed by Ameritas Life Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. v. Wilmington Trust N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameritas Life Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Kaan Ekiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust N.A.
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Represented By: Matthew B. Goeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?