BankUnited, N.A. v. Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: BankUnited, N.A.
Defendant: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00982
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2022 Filing 7 Letter to Clerk of Superior Court, dated 8/19/2022, from the Clerk of Court regarding remand of case. (nms)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED Granting #5 Joint Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/19/2022. (nms)
August 19, 2022 Filing 5 Joint Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court, by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benedek, Marla) Modified on 8/19/2022 (nms).
August 19, 2022 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #6 . (nms)
August 10, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Sompo International for Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benedek, Marla)
August 3, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benedek, Marla) Modified on 8/3/2022 (nms).
August 3, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 3, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: The disclosure statement filed as an attachment to D.I. #3 has been removed from that filing. Disclosure statements need to be filed independently on the docket using the appropriate filing code. Defendant is requested to refile accordingly. (nms)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number N22C-07-009 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3924080)- filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BankUnited, N.A. v. Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BankUnited, N.A.
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marla S. Benedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?