Hill v. Giumarra Vineyards Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Deta Hill
Defendant: Jerome E. Powell, Jr., JGDB Transport, LLC, Matthew Baer, John Does #1-10 and ABC Corporations 1-10
Cross Defendant: Giumarra Vineyards Corp. and Innovative Transport Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv01047
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laurence I. Gross for Matthew Baer, Innovative Transport Limited Liability Company, and Jerome E. Powell, Jr. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: To ensure that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this matter, Plaintiff Deta Hill shall within 14 days of the date of this order comply with the Court's April 18, 2022, Standing Order Regarding Disclosure of Citizenship of Organizational Entities in Diversity Cases. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/26/2022. (kmd)
September 22, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laurence I. Gross - filed by Innovative Transport Limited Liability Company. (Crawford, William)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laurence I. Gross, filed by Innovative Transport Limited Liability Company. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/22/2022. (kmd)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vlada Tasich, Esq., filed by Giumarra Vineyards Corp.; #54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Portner, filed by Deta Hill. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/22/2022. (kmd)
September 20, 2022 Filing 56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vlada Tasich, Esq. - filed by Giumarra Vineyards Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certification to be admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Connors, Kevin)
September 20, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Connors on behalf of Giumarra Vineyards Corp. (Connors, Kevin)
September 7, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Portner - filed by Deta Hill. (Carmine, Kenneth)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Daube, Megan Zei, Stephen E. Geulding, filed by JGDB Transport, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/6/2022. (kmd)
September 2, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Daube Megan Zei Stephen E. Geulding - filed by JGDB Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Clark, Delia)
August 31, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth F Carmine on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Carmine, Kenneth)
August 29, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Delia A Clark on behalf of JGDB Transport, LLC (Clark, Delia)
August 23, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Crawford on behalf of Matthew Baer, Innovative Transport Limited Liability Company, Jerome E. Powell, Jr (Crawford, William)
August 17, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 10, 2022 Filing 49 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/9/2022. (nmg)
August 10, 2022 Filing 48 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:22-cv-00514. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT THE COURT HAVING FOUND THAT THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA IS NOT A PROPER VENUE FOR THIS ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1391, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(A), THIS MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/10/22. 8/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
August 9, 2022 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Motion Hearing held on 8/9/22 re #35 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP., #36 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-claims filed by GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP., #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP. Court Reporter: ESR. (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE: The in-person motion hearing previously scheduled for August 9, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO is hereby CONVERTED to a ZOOM conference, etc. (nds) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 44 Letter to the Honorable Judge Robreno, dated 8/8/22 by DETA HILL (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
July 20, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Daube on behalf of JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC with Certificate of Service(Daube, Laura) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS (ECF NOS. 29, 36), WHICH IS CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JULY 27, 2022, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED. THE HEARING ON THE MOTIONS WILL NOW BE HELD ON AUGUST 9, 2022 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 15A, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/14/22. 7/14/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
July 12, 2022 Filing 41 Letter dated July 12, 2022 by DETA HILL. (PORTNER, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Filing 40 Letter dated July 11, 2022 by DETA HILL. (PORTNER, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT A HEARING TO CONSIDER DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #36 WILL BE HELD ON JULY 27, 2022 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO IN COURTROOM 15A, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/11/22. 7/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) Modified on 7/12/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
July 5, 2022 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-claims filed by MATTHEW BAER, INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, JEROME E. POWELL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GROSS, LAURENCE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
July 1, 2022 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-claims filed by JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim)(ZEI, MEGAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 17, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-claims filed by GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(TASICH, VLADA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 17, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP...(TASICH, VLADA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 15, 2022 Filing 34 Response re #33 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Matthew Baer's by JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ZEI, MEGAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 14, 2022 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC, GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP. by MATTHEW BAER.(GROSS, LAURENCE) Modified on 6/15/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 14, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE I. GROSS on behalf of MATTHEW BAER with Certification of Service(GROSS, LAURENCE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DETA HILL re: MICHAEL DAMIANO served Summons and Complaint upon MATTHEW BAER by PERSONAL SERVICE via Posted On Premises. MATTHEW BAER answer due 6/8/2022. (rf, ) Modified on 6/16/2022 (rf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DETA HILL. (PORTNER, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 3, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TASICH, VLADA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 3, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL SALVATI on behalf of GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP. (SALVATI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 3, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by VLADA TASICH on behalf of GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP. with Jury Demand(TASICH, VLADA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
June 1, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to Cross-Claim of Jerome Powell by JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZEI, MEGAN) Modified on 6/2/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #23 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, JEROME E. POWELL, JR.(GROSS, LAURENCE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC, GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP. by JEROME E. POWELL, JR.(GROSS, LAURENCE) Modified on 6/1/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
May 26, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against MATTHEW BAER, GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP., INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, JEROME E. POWELL, JR by JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZEI, MEGAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO SERVE DEFENDANT MATTHEW BAER BY WAY OF FIRST CLASS, REGULAR MAIL, POSTAGE PREPAI TO BAER'S LAST KNOWN ADDRESS: 4701 SOUTH BLACK HORSE PIKE IN THE CECIL SECTION OF MONROE TOWNSHIP, NJ. FURTHER ORDERED THAT COPY OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT SHALL BE POSTED ON THE FRONT DOOR OF 4701 SOUTH BLACK HORSE PIKE IN THE CECIL SECTION OF MONROE TOWNSHIP., NJ, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/20/22. 5/20/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
May 19, 2022 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DETA HILL. GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP. waiver sent on 4/7/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (PORTNER, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Service filed by DETA HILL.Memo of Law and Cert of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(PORTNER, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
May 5, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Megan Chamberlain re: served Complaint and Summons upon Giumarra Vineyards by Regular and certified mail on 04/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PORTNER, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE I. GROSS on behalf of JEROME E. POWELL, JR (GROSS, LAURENCE) Modified on 5/3/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DETA HILL via Michael Damiano, Metro Filing Services, Inc. as to MATTHEW BAER on 4/26/2022.. (bw) Modified on 5/3/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DETA HILL. JEROME E POWELL waiver sent on 4/28/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (PORTNER, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.(GROSS, LAURENCE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from Ronald Vance, Deputy Clerk to Hon. Eduardo C. Robreno to Scott A. Portner, Esq., dated April 26, 2022 re: A review of the Court's records shows that a pleading has not been filed in response to the complaint in the above-captioned action by Defendant Innovative Transport, LLC. You may file a request with the Clerk of Court for an entry of default in accordance with Rule 55 of the F.R.C.P. If the request for default is not filed by May 10, 2022, the Court may enter an order dismissing the case against the Defendant(s) for lack of prosecution. (rv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 13 Letter from Ronald Vance, Deputy Clerk to Hon. Eduardo C. Robreno to Scott A. Portner, Esq., dated April 26, 2022 re: A review of the Court's records shows that service of the complaint has not been made in the above-captioned action upon Defendant Giumarra Vineyards Corp., Jerome E. Powell, Jr. and Matthew Baer. In order to eliminate delay in bringing this case to trial, service must be made by May 10, 2022. If service is not made within the time set forth above, the Court will dismiss the complaint without prejudice for lack of prosecution. (rv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DETA HILL as to JEROME E. POWELL, JR. (bw) Modified on 4/26/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DETA HILL as to JEROME E. POWELL, JR. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE I. GROSS on behalf of INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (GROSS, LAURENCE) Modified on 4/6/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Doc. 8 mailed to unreps. (er) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DETA HILL as to MATTHEW BAER. No envelope included. (bw) Modified on 4/6/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED AND TIME FOR JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC SHALL RESPOND TO THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY 5/27/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/1/22. 4/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 4/5/2022 (rf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZEI, MEGAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN C. ZEI on behalf of JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(ZEI, MEGAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN E. GEDULDIG on behalf of JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC with Certificate of Service(GEDULDIG, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DETA HILL re: CLIFFORD J. RICHWAY, JR. served Summons and Complaint upon INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY by PROCEEDING. INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DETA HILL as to GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP.. (JL) Modified on 3/2/2022 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DETA HILL re: DAVID ZIMMERMAN served Summons and Complaint upon JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC. JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022. (bw) Modified on 2/28/2022 (bw). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, MATTHEW BAER, GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORPORATION, INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, JEROME POWELL, JR. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15715624.), filed by DETA HILL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(PORTNER, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]
February 9, 2022 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW BAER, GIUMARRA VINEYARDS CORP., INNOVATIVE TRANSPORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, JGDB TRANSPORT, LLC, JEROME E. POWELL, JR. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 2/9/22 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/10/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Giumarra Vineyards Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deta Hill
Represented By: Kenneth F Carmine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Giumarra Vineyards Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Innovative Transport Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Laurence I. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome E. Powell, Jr.
Represented By: William A. Crawford
Represented By: Laurence I. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JGDB Transport, LLC
Represented By: Delia A Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Baer
Represented By: William A. Crawford
Represented By: Laurence I. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?