Kennard Demby, Jr. v. Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Kennard Demby, Jr.
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2022cv01478
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Plaintiff has not complied with the November 16, 2022 Order (D.I. #3 ). It is hereby ordered that the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE the case. (CASE CLOSED) Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/21/2022. (mpb)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The application is DENIED based on Plaintiff's annual income of $26,400. (D.I. #1 ) Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee within thirty days from the date of this order or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/16/2022. (apk)
November 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Department of Corrections - filed by Kennard Demby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mkr)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Kennard Demby, Jr. (mkr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennard Demby, Jr. v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennard Demby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?