Diven v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walton R. Diven
Defendant: Exactech, Inc. and Exactech US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01485
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9): In Re: Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigation. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/29/2022. (nms)
November 29, 2022 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. (nms)
November 29, 2022 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in the Eastern District of New York as case 1:22-cv-07223, filed 11/29/2022. (apk)
November 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Exactech US, Inc. on 11/14/2022; Exactech, Inc. on 11/14/2022. (vfm)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4004329.) - filed by Walton R. Diven. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diven v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walton R. Diven
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?