Rogers v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Elizabeth Rogers
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC and TimePayment Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv01520
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Sharon Elizabeth Rogers. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Kashishian, Ann)
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Sharon Elizabeth Rogers. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Kashishian, Ann)
January 11, 2023 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Sharon Elizabeth Rogers. TimePayment Corporation served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Kashishian, Ann)
December 28, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES. (kmd)
November 23, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TimePayment Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4009922.) - filed by Sharon Elizabeth Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vfm)
November 21, 2022 No Summons Issued. (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Elizabeth Rogers
Represented By: Ann Marie Kashishian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TimePayment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?