Laborers International Union of North America, Local No. 199 Welfare, Pension, Apprenticeship, Vacation, Annuity and Laborers-Employers Cooperative Education Trust Funds et al v. New World Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laborers International Union of North America, Local No. 199 Welfare, Pension, Apprenticeship, Vacation, Annuity and Laborers-Employers Cooperative Education Trust Funds and Laborers International Union Of North America, Local No. 199
Defendant: New World Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01614
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Best Registered Agent--Charlotte Barice on 12/29/2022, filed by Laborers International Union Of North America, Local No. 199, Laborers International Union of North America, Local No. 199 Welfare, Pension, Apprenticeship, Vacation, Annuity and Laborers-Employers Cooperative Education Trust Funds. (Newlin, Claiborne)
December 28, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
December 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New World Construction, Inc. on 12/20/2022. (srs)
December 20, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
December 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against New World Construction, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4029787.) - filed by Laborers International Union of North America, Local No. 199 Welfare, Pension, Apprenticeship, Vacation, Annuity and Laborers-Employers Cooperative Education Trust Funds, Laborers International Union Of North America, Local No. 199. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laborers International Union of North America, Local No. 199 Welfare, Pension, Apprenticeship, Vacation, Annuity and Laborers-Employers Cooperative Education Trust Funds et al v. New World Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers International Union of North America, Local No. 199 Welfare, Pension, Apprenticeship, Vacation, Annuity and Laborers-Employers Cooperative Education Trust Funds
Represented By: Claiborne S. Newlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers International Union Of North America, Local No. 199
Represented By: Claiborne S. Newlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New World Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?