Roberts v. Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maricar R. Roberts
Defendant: Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00330
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Religion)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Theresa M. Zechman for Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lisa M. Scidurlo for Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01473-RGA et al.(mpb)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sasha A. Phillips for Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01473-RGA et al.(mpb)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. answer due 6/8/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2023. (nms)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Scrivani, Stacey) Modified on 5/8/2023 (nms).
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sasha A. Phillips - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Scrivani, Stacey)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. Greenfield - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Scrivani, Stacey)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lisa M. Scidurlo - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Scrivani, Stacey)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Theresa M. Zechman - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Scrivani, Stacey)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. Greenfield, filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc., #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Theresa M. Zechman, filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc., #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sasha A. Phillips, filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc., #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lisa M. Scidurlo, filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/5/2023. (nms)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Maricar R. Roberts: For Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Junge, Gary)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. on 3/24/2023. (vfm)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4096960.) - filed by Maricar R. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricar R. Roberts
Represented By: Gary E. Junge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey A. Scrivani
Represented By: Lisa M. Scidurlo
Represented By: Sasha A. Phillips
Represented By: Theresa M. Zechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?