Henry v. Delaware State University et al
Plaintiff: Shoshannah Henry
Defendant: Delaware State University, Tony Allen, Al Dorsett and Antonio Boyle
Case Number: 1:2023cv00478
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tony Allen on 5/16/2023; Antonio Boyle on 5/16/2023; Delaware State University on 5/16/2023; Al Dorsett on 5/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued) (vfm)
May 16, 2023 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT for F.R.Civ.P.4 - filed by Shoshannah Henry. (vfm)
May 16, 2023 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Magistrate Consent - filed by Shoshannah Henry. (vfm)
May 3, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 2, 2023 Remark: Sent a copy of Rule 4 Acknowledgment, Summons, and Magistrate Consent forms via mail to address provided. (jdb)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jdb)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Tony Allen, Antonio Boyle, Delaware State University, Al Dorsett ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 1022.) - filed by Shoshannah Henry. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdb)
May 1, 2023 No Summons Issued. (jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Delaware State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoshannah Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Dorsett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?