Pfizer Inc. et al v. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited et al
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PF Prism C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC and PF Prism IMB B.V.
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00718
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 13 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE41,783 E. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal)(kmd) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/25/2023) (kmd).
August 25, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc. as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 25, 2023 CASE CLOSED per #12 Notice of Dismissal. (kmd)
August 24, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Answer Complaint to through and including September 8, 2023 - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Answer Complaint to through and including September 8, 2023, filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. Reset Answer Deadlines: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited answer due 9/8/2023; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. answer due 9/8/2023. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/24/2023. (kmd)
July 21, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to through and including August 25, 2023 - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Metzler, Sara)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to through and including August 25, 2023, filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. Reset Answer Deadlines: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited answer due 8/25/2023; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. answer due 8/25/2023. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/21/2023. (kmd)
July 6, 2023 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00717-CFC, 1:23-cv-00718-CFC(nmf)
July 6, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and related papers served on Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited on July 5, 2023, filed by C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF Prism C.V., PF Prism IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
July 5, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PBG Puerto Rico LLC, Pfizer Inc., PF Prism IMB B.V., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PF Prism C.V..Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Dellinger, Megan)
July 5, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00717-CFC, 1:23-cv-00718-CFC (rjb)
July 5, 2023 CORRECTING ENTRY: Previously filed Affidavit has been removed. Counsel is advised to refile using the proper event code. (mpb)
June 30, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited on 6/30/2023; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. on 6/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (mkr)
June 30, 2023 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: Pfizer Inc. is a parent company to C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PF PRISM C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, and PF PRISM IMB B.V. - filed by C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF Prism C.V., PF Prism IMB B.V., and Pfizer Inc. (mkr)
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE41,783 E. (mkr)
June 30, 2023 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: May 22, 2023. Date of Expiration of Patent: December 8, 2025.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/22/2025. (mkr)
June 30, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr)
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4170442.) - filed by PBG Puerto Rico LLC, Pfizer Inc., PF Prism IMB B.V., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., and PF Prism C.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mkr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. et al v. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF Prism C.V.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PBG Puerto Rico LLC
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF Prism IMB B.V.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Sara M. Metzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Sara M. Metzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?