North American Company for Life and Health Insurance v. Palermo
Plaintiff: North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
Defendant: Richard Palermo
Case Number: 1:2023cv00757
Filed: July 11, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 REQUEST for Default as to North American Company for Life and Health Insurance Declaration of Todd C. Schiltz by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Schiltz, Todd)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST for Default as to North American Company for Life and Health Insurance - filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Schiltz, Todd)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
July 19, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 14, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance.Richard Palermo served on 7/13/2023, answer due 8/3/2023. (Schiltz, Todd)
July 11, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for North American Company for Life and Health Insurance filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (smg)
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
July 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed against Richard Palermo ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4176280.) - filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg)
July 11, 2023 No Summons Issued. (smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Company for Life and Health Insurance v. Palermo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
Represented By: Todd C Schiltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Palermo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?