Moreta v. Jennings et al
Petitioner: Jose Moreta
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings and Warden Robert May
Case Number: 1:2023cv00806
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2023 Remark: Filing Fee Paid. Receipt Number 1403 (apk)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Petitioners Motion to Stay his habeas proceeding is GRANTED (D.I. #1 ). Petitioner shall file a request to lift the stay within 30 days after the exhaustion of his unexhausted claim. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 08/17/2023. (vfm)
August 2, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 Letter to the Clerk of Court from Jose Moreta regarding D.I. #4 MEMORANDUM in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jfm)
July 26, 2023 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
July 26, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel - filed by Jose Moreta. (jdb)
July 26, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Stay of Abeyance - filed by Jose Moreta. (jdb)
July 25, 2023 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #1 MOTION to Stay filed by Jose Moreta. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreta v. Jennings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Moreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Robert May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?