ImmerVision, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: ImmerVision, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01012
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #9 Stipulation Staying Case Pending Resolution Of Disputes In Related Actions filed by Apple Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/28/2023. (dlb)
September 27, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order Staying Case Pending Resolution Of Disputes In Related Actions by Apple Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu)
September 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bindu Ann George Palapura on behalf of Apple Inc. (Palapura, Bindu)
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Apple Inc. (Moore, David)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 23-1012-MN-CJB. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/20/2023. (dlw)
September 20, 2023 REMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf (dlb)
September 20, 2023 Remark: The parties should follow the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, a copy of which is found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's webpage: #https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/CJBCC2022.pdf (dlb)
September 20, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 18, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by ImmerVision, Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Simmons, John)
September 15, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by ImmerVision, Inc.. (Simmons, John)
September 15, 2023 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,795,120 B2. (vfm)
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4225019.) - filed by ImmerVision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (vfm)
September 15, 2023 No Summons Issued. (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ImmerVision, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ImmerVision, Inc.
Represented By: John David Simmons
Represented By: Dennis James Butler
Represented By: Keith Aaron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?